TX HB3749 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of electric service during extreme weather conditions.
Title
Relating to the provision of electric service during extreme weather conditions.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-01 | House | No action taken in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Governor
INTERNET
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Governor
INTERNET
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--General