TX HB3746 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the permissible uses of the floodplain management account.
Title
Relating to the permissible uses of the floodplain management account.
Sponsors
Rep. Dade Phelan [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Paul Workman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1116 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed |
2017-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-09 | House | Amended |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-02 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-20 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FLOODS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--General
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--General