TX HB3740 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dissemination of information about historically underutilized businesses and the expansion of the small business development center network.
Title
Relating to the dissemination of information about historically underutilized businesses and the expansion of the small business development center network.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3740 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03740I.htm |