TX HB3731 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain notices and information about certain releasees from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice that are provided to or made accessible to criminal justice agencies.
Title
Relating to certain notices and information about certain releasees from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice that are provided to or made accessible to criminal justice agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2015-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement