TX HB371 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and penalties for possession of one ounce or less of marihuana.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and penalties for possession of one ounce or less of marihuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1847 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB371 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00371I.htm |