TX HB3707 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an inspection program to deter cattle theft; authorizing an administrative penalty; authorizing an assessment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an inspection program to deter cattle theft; authorizing an administrative penalty; authorizing an assessment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2017-04-03HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback