TX HB3703 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prescription of low-THC cannabis for medical use by certain qualified physicians to patients with certain medical conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prescription of low-THC cannabis for medical use by certain qualified physicians to patients with certain medical conditions.

Sponsors

Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]
Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]
Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]
Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]
Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]
Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Peter Flores [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Kirk Watson [D]Sen. Royce West [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1824 (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1097 (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1824
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-15SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-14SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1097
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-07HouseAmended 1-Klick
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2019-04-11HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2019-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2019-04-08HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-20HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback