TX HB3702 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting the enactment of a law that imposes a tax on certain transactions that either convey a security or involve specified derivative contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting the enactment of a law that imposes a tax on certain transactions that either convey a security or involve specified derivative contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#725 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 2nd time RV#699 (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Finance
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#725
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#699
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2001 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Finance
HJR140 (Enabling for) 2021-05-13 - Referred to Finance

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback