TX HB370 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the implementation of certain rules regarding public school accountability adopted by the commissioner of education or the Texas Education Agency.
Title
Relating to the implementation of certain rules regarding public school accountability adopted by the commissioner of education or the Texas Education Agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability