TX HB3694 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on the appraised value of certain rapidly appreciating residence homesteads in specified areas for ad valorem tax purposes.
Title
Relating to a limitation on the appraised value of certain rapidly appreciating residence homesteads in specified areas for ad valorem tax purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous