TX HB3688 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of the identity of certain landowners who participate in a State Soil and Water Conservation Board program to manage or eradicate an invasive species.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of the identity of certain landowners who participate in a State Soil and Water Conservation Board program to manage or eradicate an invasive species.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB634 (Similar To) 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB634 (Similar To) 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB634 (Similar To) 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21