TX HB3687 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disclosure of lobbying contract information by political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the disclosure of lobbying contract information by political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Glenn Rogers [R] | Rep. David Spiller [R] |
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-23 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Electronic Information Systems
LOBBYISTS & LOBBYING
Political Subdivisions
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Electronic Information Systems
LOBBYISTS & LOBBYING
Political Subdivisions