TX HB3682 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Summary
Relating to the regulation of uninhabitable, unsafe, or abandoned structures by certain counties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of uninhabitable, unsafe, or abandoned structures by certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-15 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-11 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Safety
SUBSTANDARD BUILDINGS
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Safety
SUBSTANDARD BUILDINGS