TX HB3679 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2286 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Reported enrolled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback