TX HB3679 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to signs informing motorists of facilities providing alternative fuels and electric vehicle charging stations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to signs informing motorists of facilities providing alternative fuels and electric vehicle charging stations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-15SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-05-15SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-31HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-03-31HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback