TX HB3674 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-21 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-21 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the certification of unopposed candidates for the board of directors of the North Harris County Regional Water Authority.
Title
Relating to the certification of unopposed candidates for the board of directors of the North Harris County Regional Water Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-21 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
NORTH HARRIS COUNTY REGIONAL WATER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Elections--General
NORTH HARRIS COUNTY REGIONAL WATER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility