TX HB3671 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the reporting of certain orders and convictions to the Department of Public Safety and Federal Bureau of Investigation for use with the National Instant Criminal Background Check System for the transfer of firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the reporting of certain orders and convictions to the Department of Public Safety and Federal Bureau of Investigation for use with the National Instant Criminal Background Check System for the transfer of firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback