TX HB367 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to donation and distribution of surplus food at public schools and grace period policies for public school students with insufficient balances on prepaid meal cards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to donation and distribution of surplus food at public schools and grace period policies for public school students with insufficient balances on prepaid meal cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#345 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-20HouseAmended
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19HouseRecord vote
2017-04-19HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-21HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-11-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback