TX HB367 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on August 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-14 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the deposit of money received from the federal government and the authority of the comptroller concerning related funds and accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the deposit of money received from the federal government and the authority of the comptroller concerning related funds and accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#157 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-14SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-13HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-13HouseRecord vote
2017-08-13HousePassed
2017-08-13HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-12HousePassed to engrossment
2017-08-12HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-08-12HousePostponed
2017-08-12HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-08-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-08-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-08-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-08-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-08-02HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-08-02HouseRead first time
2017-08-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback