TX HB3668 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of assessment instruments in public schools, eliminating the requirement to use public school assessment instruments as a criterion for promotion or graduation, and the temporary suspension of certain accountability determinations for a school district or campus in a school year in which the operations of the district or campus are disrupted as a result of a declared disaster.
Title
Relating to the administration of assessment instruments in public schools, eliminating the requirement to use public school assessment instruments as a criterion for promotion or graduation, and the temporary suspension of certain accountability determinations for a school district or campus in a school year in which the operations of the district or campus are disrupted as a result of a declared disaster.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] |
Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Ann Johnson [D] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS