TX HB3656 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the classification of certain construction workers and the eligibility of those workers for unemployment benefits; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the classification of certain construction workers and the eligibility of those workers for unemployment benefits; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - Failed to pass RV#1050 (Y: 66 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1050 |
2021-05-13 | House | Failed to pass |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
CONSTRUCTION & BUILDING MATERIALS
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Labor
Labor--General
Labor--Unemployment
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
CONSTRUCTION & BUILDING MATERIALS
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Labor
Labor--General
Labor--Unemployment
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS