TX HB365 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability arising from farm animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability arising from farm animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#74 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-12SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-12SenateRead first time
2021-04-06SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-01HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-01HouseRecord vote RV#74
2021-04-01HousePassed
2021-04-01HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-31HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-31HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-03-31HouseAmended 1-Murr
2021-03-31HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-31HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1078 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
SB1078 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB365
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00365I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00365H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00365E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00365S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00365F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00365H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00365I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00365H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00365H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00365E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00365E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB365&RcdVtNo=74&Ch=H&Dt=04/01/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=1

Bill Comments

feedback