TX HB3644 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts in the state treasury, the dedication and rededication of revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.
Title
Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts in the state treasury, the dedication and rededication of revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-04 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3644 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03644I.htm |