TX HB3635 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to accountability and standards for districts of innovation.
Title
Relating to accountability and standards for districts of innovation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--School Districts