TX HB3629 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for the Brazosport College District to offer a baccalaureate degree program in nursing.
Title
Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for the Brazosport College District to offer a baccalaureate degree program in nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1083 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-18 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BRAZOSPORT COLLEGE
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES