TX HB3625 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of the governor's university research initiative.
Title
Relating to the administration of the governor's university research initiative.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. John Raney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1525 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
SB1525 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
SB1525 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
Subjects
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
GOVERNOR'S UNIVERSITY RESEARCH INITIATIVE ADVISORY BOARD
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
GOVERNOR'S UNIVERSITY RESEARCH INITIATIVE ADVISORY BOARD
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed