TX HB362 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a fund to assist local governments with the acquisition of voting system equipment.
Title
Relating to the creation of a fund to assist local governments with the acquisition of voting system equipment.
Sponsors
Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] |
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1184 (Y: 120 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1184 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Klick |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2353 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Elections
Elections--Voting Systems
Legislature
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Elections
Elections--Voting Systems
Legislature
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control