TX HB3616 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Hearing: May 18 @ 8:00 am in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of massage therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of massage therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#297
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3616
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03616I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03616H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03616E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03616I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03616H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03616H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03616E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03616E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3616&RcdVtNo=297&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback