TX HB3606 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-34)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a report regarding certain health and safety information prepared by the Texas Education Agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a report regarding certain health and safety information prepared by the Texas Education Agency.

Sponsors

Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Eric Johnson [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]
Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-30HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback