TX HB3600 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of the commercial oyster mariculture advisory board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of the commercial oyster mariculture advisory board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#364 (Y: 140 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#352 (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-21SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#364
2021-04-21HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20HouseRecord vote RV#352
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3600
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03600I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03600S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03600I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03600H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03600E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03600E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03600S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03600S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3600&RcdVtNo=352&Ch=H&Dt=04/20/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3600&RcdVtNo=364&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback