TX HB3598 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the minimum term of imprisonment and changing the eligibility for community supervision, mandatory supervision, and parole for persons convicted of intoxication manslaughter.
Title
Relating to increasing the minimum term of imprisonment and changing the eligibility for community supervision, mandatory supervision, and parole for persons convicted of intoxication manslaughter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1092 (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Amended RV#1076 (Y: 120 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Amended RV#1076 (Y: 120 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1092 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1076 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-13 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2021-05-13 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2021-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-12 | House | Postponed 5/12/21 10:25 PM |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-07 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID