TX HB3593 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to instruction in career and technology education provided by public schools, including instruction in technology applications, cybersecurity, and computer coding, and to consideration of completed practicums and internships in school accountability ratings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to instruction in career and technology education provided by public schools, including instruction in technology applications, cybersecurity, and computer coding, and to consideration of completed practicums and internships in school accountability ratings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1869 (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#764 (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#697 (Y: 112 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-21SenateReported favorably as amended
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-23HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3593
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03593I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03593H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03593E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03593S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03593F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3593&RcdVtNo=697&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3593&RcdVtNo=764&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3593&RcdVtNo=1869&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=165

Bill Comments

feedback