TX HB3589 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to specialty license plates to honor certain Purple Heart recipients.
Title
Relating to specialty license plates to honor certain Purple Heart recipients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AWARDS, MEDALS, PRIZES
Law Enforcement
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Law Enforcement
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3589 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03589I.htm |