TX HB3588 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan coverage for colorectal cancer early detection.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage for colorectal cancer early detection.
Sponsors
Rep. John Smithee [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Ann Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1028 (Same As) 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21