TX HB3563 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creating the criminal offense of tampering with an electronic monitoring device.
Title
Relating to creating the criminal offense of tampering with an electronic monitoring device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1036 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1036 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB831 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION