TX HB3562 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to forms for creating or revoking a transfer on death deed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to forms for creating or revoking a transfer on death deed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB874 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback