TX HB3548 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the applicability of certain immunity and liability laws to the nonprofit corporation established by the Texas Public Finance Authority to issue revenue bonds to open-enrollment charter schools for those schools to provide educational facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the applicability of certain immunity and liability laws to the nonprofit corporation established by the Texas Public Finance Authority to issue revenue bonds to open-enrollment charter schools for those schools to provide educational facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1062 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-31HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-31HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback