TX HB3535 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to low income housing tax credits awarded for certain developments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to low income housing tax credits awarded for certain developments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-31 - House - HB 3535Third Reading House (Y: 79 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 3535Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-19 Filed without the Governor's signature
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-06-01HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-31HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-31SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2015-05-31HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-31HouseRecord vote
2015-05-31HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2015-05-31HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2015-05-30SenateRecord vote
2015-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2015-05-30HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2015-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2015-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2015-05-29HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2015-05-29SenateSenate appoints conferees
2015-05-29SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2015-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2015-05-27SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2015-05-27SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2015-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2015-05-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27HouseHouse requests conference committee
2015-05-27HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2015-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenatePassed
2015-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-13SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2015-05-13SenateRead first time
2015-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-05HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HouseRecord vote
2015-05-05HousePassed
2015-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-05HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-05HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-05-01HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-23HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2015-04-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-18HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2015-03-18HouseRead first time
2015-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback