TX HB3533 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inspection procedures in certain long-term care facilities and the creation of a long-term care legislative oversight committee.
Title
Relating to inspection procedures in certain long-term care facilities and the creation of a long-term care legislative oversight committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1063 (Y: 98 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Legislature
LONG-TERM CARE
Nursing Homes
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Legislature
LONG-TERM CARE
Nursing Homes