TX HB353 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the consideration of certain student differentials based on racial and ethnic groups and sex under the public school accountability system.
Title
Relating to the consideration of certain student differentials based on racial and ethnic groups and sex under the public school accountability system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB393 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General