TX HB3522 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requirement that certain persons taking oysters on a licensed commercial oyster boat obtain a commercial fisherman's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requirement that certain persons taking oysters on a licensed commercial oyster boat obtain a commercial fisherman's license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#582
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB666 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback