TX HB3520 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restrictions on the age of persons employed by or allowed on the premises of a sexually oriented business; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to restrictions on the age of persons employed by or allowed on the premises of a sexually oriented business; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] | Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] |
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 315 |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-26 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB315 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES