TX HB3510 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to work from remote locations by certain employees of certain entities licensed by the Office of Consumer Credit Commissioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to work from remote locations by certain employees of certain entities licensed by the Office of Consumer Credit Commissioner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#582
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-09HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback