TX HB3509 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to maximum liability limits for windstorm and hail insurance coverage provided through the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
Title
Relating to maximum liability limits for windstorm and hail insurance coverage provided through the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Property & Casualty
WINDSTORM DEVICES & INSURANCE
WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Property & Casualty
WINDSTORM DEVICES & INSURANCE
WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS