TX HB3494 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a demonstration program for real-time processing of workers' compensation authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills.
Title
Relating to a demonstration program for real-time processing of workers' compensation authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. John Raney [R] |
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |