TX HB3488 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing public benefit corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing public benefit corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#974 (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2017-04-04HouseRead first time
2017-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback