TX HB3485 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information reported through the Public Education Information Management System and to parents regarding disciplinary measures used by a school district.
Title
Relating to information reported through the Public Education Information Management System and to parents regarding disciplinary measures used by a school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#966 (Y: 86 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#966 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Wu |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--School Districts