TX HB3482 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of "indigent defense compensation expenditures" for purposes of the adjustment of a county's no-new-revenue maintenance and operations rate to reflect increases in those expenditures.
Title
Relating to the definition of "indigent defense compensation expenditures" for purposes of the adjustment of a county's no-new-revenue maintenance and operations rate to reflect increases in those expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#863 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#863 |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-07 | House | Amended 1-Rose |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB638 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
Taxation
Taxation--County
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
Taxation
Taxation--County
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate