TX HB3477 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Record vote RV#1086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Record vote RV#1086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the termination of corporate privileges for certain business entities under enforcement action for a violation of environmental laws.
Title
Relating to the termination of corporate privileges for certain business entities under enforcement action for a violation of environmental laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#1086 (Y: 64 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1086 |
2021-05-13 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-03 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-30 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
SECRETARY OF STATE
Business & Commerce--General
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
SECRETARY OF STATE