TX HB3476 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity issued to water utilities inside the boundaries or extraterritorial jurisdiction of certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity issued to water utilities inside the boundaries or extraterritorial jurisdiction of certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1733 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#554 (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#554 (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1733 |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House requests conference committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2021-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#554 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Utilities
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
Water--Development
City Government--Utilities
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
Water--Development